THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 726-4447
Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Street South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-1252 Lawrence Ave E
Victoria Medical Group
North York ON M3A 1C3
Phone: 4163561311
Fax: 4166091102
Address: Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2391 Eglington Ave East
Toronto Ontario M1K 2M5
Phone: (416) 750-9000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Janmohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Address: 2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 726-4447
Address: Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Street South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-1252 Lawrence Ave E
Victoria Medical Group
North York ON M3A 1C3
Phone: 4163561311
Fax: 4166091102
Address: Rouge Valley Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2391 Eglington Ave East
Toronto Ontario M1K 2M5
Phone: (416) 750-9000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Janmohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIRALI KASSAMALI JANMOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANMOHAMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIRALI KASSAMALI JANMOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANMOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993