THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:28:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Room 4SE 114
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland C. Jong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong (CPSO#: 66899 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 4SE-114
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6334

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Room 4SE 114
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland C. Jong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong (CPSO#: 66899 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 4SE-114
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6334

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND CHUCK KIT JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROLAND CHUCK KIT JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993