THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:59:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1375 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Ontario M6L 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 243-8487
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 660 Eglinton Ave. W Unit 5C
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3V2
Phone: (905) 206-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 247 Simcoe St N #301
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Phone: (905) 438-055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1315 Finch Ave W
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 633-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 208 Bloor St W #711
Toronto Ontario M5S 3B4
Phone: (416) 921-133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 807 Broadview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3695 Keele St
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N1
Phone: (416) 631-0007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1717 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto Ontario M1R 2X7
Phone: (416) 335-0323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Wynford Dr Suite 312
Toronto Ontario M3C 1W1
Phone: (416) 443-2626
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Silver Star Blvd Unit 209
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 321-9243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deitel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Deitel (CPSO#: 66912 )
Business Address: 100A - 3695 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 631-0007
Business Address: D1
2355 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6M 4A2
(416) 243-8487
Business Address: 17171 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1R 2X7
(416) 335-0323
Business Address: 114 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G5
(416) 633-4441
Business Address: 711 - 208 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 3B4
(416) 921-1333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1375 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Ontario M6L 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 243-8487
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 660 Eglinton Ave. W Unit 5C
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3V2
Phone: (905) 206-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 247 Simcoe St N #301
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Phone: (905) 438-055
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1315 Finch Ave W
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 633-4441
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 208 Bloor St W #711
Toronto Ontario M5S 3B4
Phone: (416) 921-133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 807 Broadview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3695 Keele St
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N1
Phone: (416) 631-0007
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1717 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto Ontario M1R 2X7
Phone: (416) 335-0323
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Wynford Dr Suite 312
Toronto Ontario M3C 1W1
Phone: (416) 443-2626
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 385 Silver Star Blvd Unit 209
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 321-9243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deitel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Deitel (CPSO#: 66912 )
Business Address: 100A - 3695 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 631-0007
Business Address: D1
2355 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6M 4A2
(416) 243-8487
Business Address: 17171 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1R 2X7
(416) 335-0323
Business Address: 114 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G5
(416) 633-4441
Business Address: 711 - 208 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 3B4
(416) 921-1333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE LAWRENCE DEITEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEITEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE LAWRENCE DEITEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEITEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993