THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Miami, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sherway Drive
2nd Floor Medical Clinic
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 521 4196
Fax: 416 521 4082
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Extension: 32382
Fax: 4167473399
Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7557
Fax: (905) 848-7669
Address: 9-2145 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 4L9
Phone: 9058963000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Douen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Douen (CPSO#: 66918 )
Business Address: 134-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
9058482350
Business Address: 5071 Forest Hill Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5A7
4168190426

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Miami, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sherway Drive
2nd Floor Medical Clinic
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 521 4196
Fax: 416 521 4082
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Extension: 32382
Fax: 4167473399
Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7557
Fax: (905) 848-7669
Address: 9-2145 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 4L9
Phone: 9058963000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Douen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Douen (CPSO#: 66918 )
Business Address: 134-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
9058482350
Business Address: 5071 Forest Hill Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 5A7
4168190426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE GENE DOUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE GENE DOUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Miami, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993