THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:54:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. G. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martin (CPSO#: 66938 )
Business Address: 101-14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 0C4
(705) 429-8270
Business Address: 31 Wellington Street East
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
Business Address: 31 Wellington Street East
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
Business Address: 3842 Lavender Hill Rd
Creemore ON L0M 1G0
289-440-1343
Business Address: 3842 Lavender Hill Rd
Creemore ON L0M 1G0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. G. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martin (CPSO#: 66938 )
Business Address: 101-14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach Ontario L9Z 0C4
(705) 429-8270
Business Address: 31 Wellington Street East
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
Business Address: 31 Wellington Street East
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
Business Address: 3842 Lavender Hill Rd
Creemore ON L0M 1G0
289-440-1343
Business Address: 3842 Lavender Hill Rd
Creemore ON L0M 1G0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GERARD MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GERARD MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993