THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-740-0428
Extension: 0
Fax: 416-740-3490

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTINE L TANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tang (CPSO#: 66951 )
Business Address: 365-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
4167400428 Extn: 0

Corporation Name: Christine L. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-740-0428
Extension: 0
Fax: 416-740-3490

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CHRISTINE L TANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tang (CPSO#: 66951 )
Business Address: 365-135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
4167400428 Extn: 0

Corporation Name: Christine L. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LOUISE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LOUISE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993