THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:06:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite de Hue, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Green Lane
units 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-764-0188
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Buu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Buu (CPSO#: 66963 )
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
units 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
905-764-0188

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Universite de Hue, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Green Lane
units 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-764-0188
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Buu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Buu (CPSO#: 66963 )
Business Address: 8 Green Lane
units 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
905-764-0188

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MY BUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MY BUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite de Hue, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993