THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG 16
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4097
Fax: (416) 480-4613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Feinstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Feinstein (CPSO#: 66979 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG16
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4216

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG 16
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4097
Fax: (416) 480-4613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Feinstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Feinstein (CPSO#: 66979 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG16
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4216

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY FEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY FEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1997
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Jan 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 1997

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993