THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:30:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: Meltzer, Simon Jonathan (Used Until: 12 Jun 2000)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 544 4900
Extension: 53130
Fax: 613 540-6174
Address: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
Phone: 6135449121
Fax: 613 544 9793
Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: 613 548 3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Brien (CPSO#: 66990 )
Business Address: Providence Continuing Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 544-4900 Extn: 53130
Business Address: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
(613) 546-1101
Business Address: 78 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232

General Information

Former Name: Meltzer, Simon Jonathan (Used Until: 12 Jun 2000)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 544 4900
Extension: 53130
Fax: 613 540-6174
Address: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
Phone: 6135449121
Fax: 613 544 9793
Address: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: 613 548 3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Brien (CPSO#: 66990 )
Business Address: Providence Continuing Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 544-4900 Extn: 53130
Business Address: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
(613) 546-1101
Business Address: 78 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 20 Dec 2022
Summary of Decision:
On December 20, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. O’Brien failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by:
  • failing to maintain boundaries with Patient A through the content/nature, tone, timing, and frequency/volume of text, email, and telephone communications with Patient A;
  • engaging in clinical encounters and communication with Patient A without remuneration;
  • altering Patient A’s chart at her request and without noting the alterations, despite maintaining in the record the original clinical notes which demarcated the changes;
  • failing to terminate his professional relationship with Patient A at an earlier date;
  • failing to seek earlier professional support and/or supervision with respect to his treatment of Patient A;
  • inappropriately accepting and engaging with Patient A’s work product containing confidential information of third parties, which was sent to his email; and
  • failing to expressly and directly instruct Patient A to stop sharing work product containing confidential information of third parties with him.
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  • Dr. O’Brien attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
  • the Registrar suspend Dr. O’Brien’s certificate of registration for eight months commencing January 13, 2023;
  • Dr. O’Brien pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 20, 2023. 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-12-20

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 20 Dec 2022
Summary of Decision:
On December 20, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. O’Brien failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by:
  • failing to maintain boundaries with Patient A through the content/nature, tone, timing, and frequency/volume of text, email, and telephone communications with Patient A;
  • engaging in clinical encounters and communication with Patient A without remuneration;
  • altering Patient A’s chart at her request and without noting the alterations, despite maintaining in the record the original clinical notes which demarcated the changes;
  • failing to terminate his professional relationship with Patient A at an earlier date;
  • failing to seek earlier professional support and/or supervision with respect to his treatment of Patient A;
  • inappropriately accepting and engaging with Patient A’s work product containing confidential information of third parties, which was sent to his email; and
  • failing to expressly and directly instruct Patient A to stop sharing work product containing confidential information of third parties with him.
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  • Dr. O’Brien attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
  • the Registrar suspend Dr. O’Brien’s certificate of registration for eight months commencing January 13, 2023;
  • Dr. O’Brien pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by January 20, 2023. 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-12-20

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 13 Sep 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 13 Jan 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993