THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:35:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatrics
Kids Come First Clinic
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 737 7600
Extension: 6513
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record may send an e-mail to [email protected] or fax to (613-845-0079).
Date Received: 23 Jan 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesia Kozyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kozyra (CPSO#: 66998 )
Business Address: PO Box 62 Stn Main
Cumberland ON K4C 1E5
Business Address: 347 Preston Street
Suite 350
Ottawa Ontario K1S 2E3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Pediatrics
Kids Come First Clinic
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 737 7600
Extension: 6513
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record may send an e-mail to [email protected] or fax to (613-845-0079).
Date Received: 23 Jan 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesia Kozyra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kozyra (CPSO#: 66998 )
Business Address: PO Box 62 Stn Main
Cumberland ON K4C 1E5
Business Address: 347 Preston Street
Suite 350
Ottawa Ontario K1S 2E3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESIA MARIA ANNA KOZYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZYRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESIA MARIA ANNA KOZYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZYRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993