THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:40:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Immune and Digestive Health Institute
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 932 8238
Fax: 647 932 8237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Gryfe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gryfe (CPSO#: 67006 )
Business Address: 540 Bedford Park Ave
North York ON M5M 1K3
647-932-8238
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
455 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Immune and Digestive Health Institute
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 932 8238
Fax: 647 932 8237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Gryfe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gryfe (CPSO#: 67006 )
Business Address: 540 Bedford Park Ave
North York ON M5M 1K3
647-932-8238
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
455 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GRYFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYFE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GRYFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYFE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993