THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:09:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Address: Unit 9
1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E6
Phone: (905) 281-9337
Fax: (905) 281-9849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manson M.T. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak (CPSO#: 67036 )
Business Address: 200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: 1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Unit 9
Mississauga Ontario L4C 4E6
(905) 281-9337

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Address: Unit 9
1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E6
Phone: (905) 281-9337
Fax: (905) 281-9849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manson M.T. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak (CPSO#: 67036 )
Business Address: 200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: 1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Unit 9
Mississauga Ontario L4C 4E6
(905) 281-9337

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANSON MANG TSUN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANSON MANG TSUN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993