THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207 Woolwich Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-241-5316
Fax: 519-823-9639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 23 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Nemni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nemni (CPSO#: 67040 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 207 Woolwich Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-241-5316
Fax: 519-823-9639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 23 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacqueline Nemni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nemni (CPSO#: 67040 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE CAROLE NEMNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEMNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE CAROLE NEMNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEMNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993