THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 76420
Fax: (613) 737-8599

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Saloojee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Saloojee (CPSO#: 67042 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 76420

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 76420
Fax: (613) 737-8599

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Oct 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Saloojee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Saloojee (CPSO#: 67042 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 76420

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVAAZ AHMED SALOOJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALOOJEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVAAZ AHMED SALOOJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALOOJEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993