THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Box 430
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernhard A. Volz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Volz (CPSO#: 67089 )
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Box 430
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Box 430
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernhard A. Volz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Volz (CPSO#: 67089 )
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Box 430
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B0
(905) 563-5315

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNHARD ANTON VOLZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNHARD ANTON VOLZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993