THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
101-308 Hunt Club rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138013380
Fax: 6138014380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Bourgault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bourgault (CPSO#: 67090 )
Business Address: 300-100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950
Business Address: 1364 Gaultois Ave
Orléans ON K1C 3G6
Business Address: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
613 801-3380
Business Address: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
613 801-3380
Business Address: 1364 Gaultois Ave
Orléans ON K1C 3G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
101-308 Hunt Club rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138013380
Fax: 6138014380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Bourgault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bourgault (CPSO#: 67090 )
Business Address: 300-100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
(613) 564-3950
Business Address: 1364 Gaultois Ave
Orléans ON K1C 3G6
Business Address: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
613 801-3380
Business Address: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
613 801-3380
Business Address: 1364 Gaultois Ave
Orléans ON K1C 3G6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE ANNE BOURGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUISE ANNE BOURGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURGAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993