THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 07:36:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH PACE Clinic
Room 1326
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 32722
Fax: (416) 583-1296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Babak Abadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abadi (CPSO#: 67093 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH PACE Clinic
Room 1326
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 32722
Fax: (416) 583-1296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Babak Abadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abadi (CPSO#: 67093 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABAK ABADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABAK ABADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993