THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:39:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 420
1600 Steeles ave. W
Concord Ontario L4K 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 760-1415
Fax: (905) 760-2735
Address: 250 Harding blvd w, suite 401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-8400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Jordan and Sheryl Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brown (CPSO#: 67116 ) Dr. J. Brown (CPSO#: 67148 )
Business Address: Suite 420
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord Ontario L4K 4M2
(905) 760-1415
Business Address: Suite 202
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-8400

Corporation Name: H. Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 420
1600 Steeles ave. W
Concord Ontario L4K 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 760-1415
Fax: (905) 760-2735
Address: 250 Harding blvd w, suite 401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-8400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Jordan and Sheryl Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brown (CPSO#: 67116 ) Dr. J. Brown (CPSO#: 67148 )
Business Address: Suite 420
1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord Ontario L4K 4M2
(905) 760-1415
Business Address: Suite 202
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-8400

Corporation Name: H. Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERYL ESTELLE ZIVE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERYL ESTELLE ZIVE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1993