THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:13:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Real Estate Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Real Estate
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Tham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tham (CPSO#: 67187 ) Dr. F. Sem (CPSO#: 67182 )
Business Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Unit 10
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273

Corporation Name: Francis Sem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tham (CPSO#: 67187 ) Dr. F. Sem (CPSO#: 67182 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6435

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Real Estate Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Real Estate
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Tham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tham (CPSO#: 67187 ) Dr. F. Sem (CPSO#: 67182 )
Business Address: Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Unit 10
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 6N5
(416) 741-2273

Corporation Name: Francis Sem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tham (CPSO#: 67187 ) Dr. F. Sem (CPSO#: 67182 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6435

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS WAI CHUN SEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCIS WAI CHUN SEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993