THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:47:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
4th floor, Building 3
1001 Queen St West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34389
Fax: (416) 780-1957
Address: 1920 Yonge St, Suite 200
Toronto
Ontario
Toronto Ontario M4S 3E2
Phone: (416) 572-7500
Fax: (416) 572-7501
Address: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34389
Fax: (416) 780-1957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Rootenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rootenberg (CPSO#: 67193 )
Business Address: Suite 200
455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G8
Business Address: Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 34389
Business Address: Suite 200
1920 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3E2
(416) 572-7500
Business Address: Suite 6060
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Address: 18th Floor
2 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4V 1L5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
4th floor, Building 3
1001 Queen St West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34389
Fax: (416) 780-1957
Address: 1920 Yonge St, Suite 200
Toronto
Ontario
Toronto Ontario M4S 3E2
Phone: (416) 572-7500
Fax: (416) 572-7501
Address: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34389
Fax: (416) 780-1957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Rootenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rootenberg (CPSO#: 67193 )
Business Address: Suite 200
455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G8
Business Address: Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 34389
Business Address: Suite 200
1920 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3E2
(416) 572-7500
Business Address: Suite 6060
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Business Address: 18th Floor
2 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4V 1L5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN HOWARD ROOTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOTENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN HOWARD ROOTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOTENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993