THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:37:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Edgar Lane
Aweres Township ON P6A 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057770059
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rose-Marie Gieni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gieni (CPSO#: 67230 )
Business Address: 20 Edgar Lane
Aweres Township Ontario P6A 0E4
(705) 254-8068

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Edgar Lane
Aweres Township ON P6A 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057770059
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rose-Marie Gieni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gieni (CPSO#: 67230 )
Business Address: 20 Edgar Lane
Aweres Township Ontario P6A 0E4
(705) 254-8068

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSE-MARIE AGNES LOUISE GIENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIENI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSE-MARIE AGNES LOUISE GIENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIENI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1993