THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simone Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Douglas (CPSO#: 67288 )
Business Address: Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 832-2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simone Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Douglas (CPSO#: 67288 )
Business Address: Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(905) 832-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMONE ANN DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMONE ANN DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 1993