THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:23:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6094
Fax: (905) 521-6153

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Clase Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clase (CPSO#: 67344 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Address: White Pines Wellness Centre
1745 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
(519) 445-2418
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6094
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Halton Healthcare Burlington Satellite Dialysis Ce
2160 Itabashi Way
Burlington Ontario L7M 4J8
(905) 319-6572
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-6094
Fax: (905) 521-6153

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Clase Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Clase (CPSO#: 67344 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford General Hospital
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Business Address: White Pines Wellness Centre
1745 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken Ontario N0A 1M0
(519) 445-2418
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6094
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Halton Healthcare Burlington Satellite Dialysis Ce
2160 Itabashi Way
Burlington Ontario L7M 4J8
(905) 319-6572
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY CLASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLASE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY CLASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLASE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1993