THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:20:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnbrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 7722
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.P. Mudrik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mudrik (CPSO#: 67359 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7373
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4789

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnbrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 7722
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.P. Mudrik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mudrik (CPSO#: 67359 )
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7373
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4789

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN PAUL MUDRIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUDRIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN PAUL MUDRIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUDRIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Sep 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1993