THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:26:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 23 Jul 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ewa Szumacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szumacher (CPSO#: 67360 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4982

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 23 Jul 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ewa Szumacher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szumacher (CPSO#: 67360 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4982

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EWA FRANCISZKA SZUMACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUMACHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EWA FRANCISZKA SZUMACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZUMACHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1993