THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:36:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maggy Kyrollos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kyrollos (CPSO#: 67367 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maggy Kyrollos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kyrollos (CPSO#: 67367 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGGY GEORGES HALIM KYROLLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYROLLOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGGY GEORGES HALIM KYROLLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYROLLOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1993