THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:48:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Andhra Medical College, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Health Sciences North
Kirkwood Place
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 675 5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: 705 688 7770
Address: Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive,
Sudbury ON
P3E 1X3
Sudbury Ontario P3E1X3
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 8042
Fax: 7056887766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Psychotherapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Psychotherapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramamohan Veluri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Veluri (CPSO#: 67435 )
Business Address: Sudbury Algoma Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 670-8989
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, TELUGU
Medical School: Andhra Medical College, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Health Sciences North
Kirkwood Place
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 675 5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: 705 688 7770
Address: Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive,
Sudbury ON
P3E 1X3
Sudbury Ontario P3E1X3
Phone: 7055237100
Extension: 8042
Fax: 7056887766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Psychotherapy Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Psychotherapy
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramamohan Veluri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Veluri (CPSO#: 67435 )
Business Address: Sudbury Algoma Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 670-8989
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMAMOHAN VELURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMAMOHAN VELURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Andhra Medical College, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1993