THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:23:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ateneo De Davao University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG, VISAYAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 19
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 349-1270
Fax: (647) 349-1271
Address: 1700 Eglinton Ave E
Unit A3
North York ON M4A 2X4
Phone: 647-948-7833
Fax: 647-349-1271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Alegado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Alegado (CPSO#: 67460 )
Business Address: Unit 19
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L6
(647) 349-1270

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG, VISAYAN
Medical School: Ateneo De Davao University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 19
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 349-1270
Fax: (647) 349-1271
Address: 1700 Eglinton Ave E
Unit A3
North York ON M4A 2X4
Phone: 647-948-7833
Fax: 647-349-1271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Alegado Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Alegado (CPSO#: 67460 )
Business Address: Unit 19
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L6
(647) 349-1270

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELI ALEGADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEGADO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELI ALEGADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEGADO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Mar 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Ateneo De Davao University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1993