THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street PO 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sales (CPSO#: 67490 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street PO 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sales Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sales (CPSO#: 67490 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE SALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE SALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1993