THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
237Lakeview Drive
Kenora Ontario P9N4J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-8625
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vernon Sawatzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sawatzky (CPSO#: 67491 )
Business Address: 237 Lakeview Drive
Kenora Ontario P9N 4J7
(807) 468-8625
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
237Lakeview Drive
Kenora Ontario P9N4J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-8625
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vernon Sawatzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sawatzky (CPSO#: 67491 )
Business Address: 237 Lakeview Drive
Kenora Ontario P9N 4J7
(807) 468-8625
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
19 Aug 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 19 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 19, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vernon Wayne Sawatzky in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sawatzky to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Sawatzky's practice is restricted to the following areas:
Long-term care and surgical assisting.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 19, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vernon Wayne Sawatzky in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sawatzky to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Sawatzky's practice is restricted to the following areas:
Long-term care and surgical assisting.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1993