THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Hamilton Road
London Ontario N5V 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-2933
Fax: (519) 204-9000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malik (CPSO#: 67493 )

Corporation Name: Rebecca Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 May 2018

Corporation Name: Jones Malik Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Hamilton Road
London Ontario N5V 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-2933
Fax: (519) 204-9000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Malik (CPSO#: 67493 )

Corporation Name: Rebecca Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 May 2018

Corporation Name: Jones Malik Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Aug 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBINA MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBINA MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 29 Nov 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1993