THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5263
Fax: (416) 480-6085
Address: 9080 Yonge Street ,Level 2, unit 12
Toronto Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289- 597-7676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhad Pirouzmand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pirouzmand (CPSO#: 67591 )
Business Address: Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5263
Fax: (416) 480-6085
Address: 9080 Yonge Street ,Level 2, unit 12
Toronto Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289- 597-7676
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhad Pirouzmand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Pirouzmand (CPSO#: 67591 )
Business Address: Suite A131
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAD PIROUZMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIROUZMAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAD PIROUZMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIROUZMAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1993