THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-8667
Fax: (416) 438-6358
Address: 32227 EGLINTON AVE,EAST,UNIT143-144
Scarborough Ontario M1J3M5
Phone: 416-261-4446
Fax: 416-261-4447
Address: 2330 Kennedy Road
2330 Kennedy Road,
Toronto Ontario M1T 0A2
Phone: 416.335-1717
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arrazaghi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arrazaghi (CPSO#: 67643 )
Business Address: 207 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 438-8667
Business Address: Suite 3
28 Sandford Drive
Stouffville Ontario M4L 2E7
(905) 640-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-8667
Fax: (416) 438-6358
Address: 32227 EGLINTON AVE,EAST,UNIT143-144
Scarborough Ontario M1J3M5
Phone: 416-261-4446
Fax: 416-261-4447
Address: 2330 Kennedy Road
2330 Kennedy Road,
Toronto Ontario M1T 0A2
Phone: 416.335-1717
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arrazaghi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arrazaghi (CPSO#: 67643 )
Business Address: 207 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 438-8667
Business Address: Suite 3
28 Sandford Drive
Stouffville Ontario M4L 2E7
(905) 640-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELWAHAB AHMED ALSED ARRAZAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARRAZAGHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELWAHAB AHMED ALSED ARRAZAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARRAZAGHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Feb 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 1994