THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre,
COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 7370
Fax: (613) 739-8400
Address: 311 McARTHUR
SUITE 301
Ottawa Ontario K1L 8M3
Phone: 613-737-7791
Extension: 209
Fax: 613-737-7644

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walsh-Bergin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Walsh-Bergin (CPSO#: 67675 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
201 - 2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 7301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre,
COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 7370
Fax: (613) 739-8400
Address: 311 McARTHUR
SUITE 301
Ottawa Ontario K1L 8M3
Phone: 613-737-7791
Extension: 209
Fax: 613-737-7644

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walsh-Bergin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Walsh-Bergin (CPSO#: 67675 )
Business Address: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
201 - 2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H2
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 7301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA WALSH-BERGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH-BERGIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA WALSH-BERGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH-BERGIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Feb 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1994