THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:28:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Taylor Creek Dr
Argyll Associates
Orleans Surgicentre
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orléans ON K4A 0Z9
Phone: 6137788888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 405-1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
Phone: 613-702-5333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryding & Gay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ryding (CPSO#: 67739 ) Dr. R. Gay (CPSO#: 66661 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(905) 721-2000 Extn: 2860
Business Address: 506 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
(613) 596-5888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Taylor Creek Dr
Argyll Associates
Orleans Surgicentre
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orléans ON K4A 0Z9
Phone: 6137788888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 405-1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
Phone: 613-702-5333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryding & Gay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ryding (CPSO#: 67739 ) Dr. R. Gay (CPSO#: 66661 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(905) 721-2000 Extn: 2860
Business Address: 506 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8R2
(613) 596-5888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LOUISE RYDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYDING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH LOUISE RYDING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYDING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994