THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:56:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision FHT
421 Greenbrook Drive Unit 23 B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cameron (CPSO#: 67759 )
Business Address: New Vision FHT
23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: New Vision FHT
421 Greenbrook Drive Unit 23 B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cameron (CPSO#: 67759 )
Business Address: New Vision FHT
23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
(519) 578-3510
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ANN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ANN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994