THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:44:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Habing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Habing (CPSO#: 67761 )
Business Address: Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B5
(905) 563-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Habing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Habing (CPSO#: 67761 )
Business Address: Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville Ontario L0R 1B5
(905) 563-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH HABING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH HABING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994