THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 King St E
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 579-0589
Fax: (519) 579-6573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elliott (CPSO#: 67778 )
Business Address: 1145 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2N3
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 King St E
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 579-0589
Fax: (519) 579-6573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elliott (CPSO#: 67778 )
Business Address: 1145 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2N3
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994