THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:22:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: (416) 340-4300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Szabo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Szabo (CPSO#: 67781 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5190
Business Address: University Health Network
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: (416) 340-4300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Szabo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Szabo (CPSO#: 67781 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5190
Business Address: University Health Network
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN SZABO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN SZABO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994