THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:12:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
Room F533
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33134
Fax: (905) 521-6068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. P. McMullin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McMullin (CPSO#: 67797 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room F533
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
Room F533
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33134
Fax: (905) 521-6068

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. P. McMullin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McMullin (CPSO#: 67797 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room F533
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH PAUL MCMULLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH PAUL MCMULLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994