THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:17:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: Njegovan, Vesna (Used Until: 07 Mar 2004)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Extension: 5415
Fax: 416-521-4116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vesna Page Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Page (CPSO#: 67802 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(416) 459-0542

General Information

Former Name: Njegovan, Vesna (Used Until: 07 Mar 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave. W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Extension: 5415
Fax: 416-521-4116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vesna Page Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Page (CPSO#: 67802 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(416) 459-0542

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VESNA PAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VESNA PAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994