THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:33:12 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Nephology
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 32299
Fax: (905) 540-6589

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 09 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Guyana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Margetts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Margetts (CPSO#: 67819 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Nephology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Nephology
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 32299
Fax: (905) 540-6589

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 09 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Guyana

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Margetts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Margetts (CPSO#: 67819 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Nephology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH MARGETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGETTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH MARGETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGETTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994