THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oaks Plaza
Unit 3 4 5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-4611
Fax: (705) 522-4158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 19 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Santosh Pudupakkam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pudupakkam (CPSO#: 67828 )
Business Address: Oaks Plaza
Unit 3-4-5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
(705) 522-4611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oaks Plaza
Unit 3 4 5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-4611
Fax: (705) 522-4158

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 19 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Santosh Pudupakkam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pudupakkam (CPSO#: 67828 )
Business Address: Oaks Plaza
Unit 3-4-5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
(705) 522-4611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANTOSH PUDUPAKKAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUDUPAKKAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANTOSH PUDUPAKKAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUDUPAKKAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994