THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:51:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Lake Ave East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 257-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Buckley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Buckley (CPSO#: 67830 )
Business Address: 299 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON K7C 1J3
613 257-2311 Extn: 5
Business Address: 299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3
(613) 257-1842

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 299 Lake Ave East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 257-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Buckley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Buckley (CPSO#: 67830 )
Business Address: 299 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON K7C 1J3
613 257-2311 Extn: 5
Business Address: 299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J3
(613) 257-1842

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN LETITIA BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN LETITIA BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994