THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:26:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Extension: 4745
Fax: (705) 523-7017
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 7056983224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Struk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Struk (CPSO#: 67834 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-2200 Extn: 4745
Business Address: 14 Elizabeth Place
Puslinch ON N0B 2J0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Extension: 4745
Fax: (705) 523-7017
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 7056983224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Struk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Struk (CPSO#: 67834 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-2200 Extn: 4745
Business Address: 14 Elizabeth Place
Puslinch ON N0B 2J0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL WILLIAM STRUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL WILLIAM STRUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994