THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:28:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton Children's Clinic
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056649992
Fax: 9056649910

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke Baird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baird (CPSO#: 66870 ) Dr. J. Baird (CPSO#: 67841 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Child Advocacy and Assessment Program
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73268
Business Address: 849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton Children's Clinic
Suite 403
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
9056649992

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton Children's Clinic
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056649992
Fax: 9056649910

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burke Baird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baird (CPSO#: 66870 ) Dr. J. Baird (CPSO#: 67841 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
Child Advocacy and Assessment Program
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73268
Business Address: 849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton Children's Clinic
Suite 403
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
9056649992

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BURKE BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BURKE BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994