THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medsport Ottawa
Suite 300
320 March Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 763-1510
Fax: (613) 270-0982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renata Frankovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Frankovich (CPSO#: 67859 )
Business Address: Medsport Ottawa
300 - 320 March Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2E3
(613) 763-1510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medsport Ottawa
Suite 300
320 March Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 763-1510
Fax: (613) 270-0982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renata Frankovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Frankovich (CPSO#: 67859 )
Business Address: Medsport Ottawa
300 - 320 March Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 2E3
(613) 763-1510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENATA JENNIFER FRANKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKOVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENATA JENNIFER FRANKOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKOVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994