THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn Edwards Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Edwards (CPSO#: 67860 )
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Address: 700 O'Loane Avenue
Stratford Ontario N5A 6S6
(519) 273-1060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn Edwards Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Edwards (CPSO#: 67860 )
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Address: 700 O'Loane Avenue
Stratford Ontario N5A 6S6
(519) 273-1060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN ROSS EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN ROSS EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994