THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:05:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679-6000
Fax: (519) 679-2736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neumann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Neumann (CPSO#: 67868 )
Business Address: Unit 204
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 679-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679-6000
Fax: (519) 679-2736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neumann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Neumann (CPSO#: 67868 )
Business Address: Unit 204
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
(519) 679-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY RICHARD NEUMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY RICHARD NEUMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994