THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:31:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 131 Frederick Campbell Street
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 338 0475
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Gartner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gartner (CPSO#: 67869 )
Business Address: Suite 102
305 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 576-1630
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 131 Frederick Campbell Street
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Emergency Medicine
Fergus Ontario N1M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 338 0475
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Gartner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gartner (CPSO#: 67869 )
Business Address: Suite 102
305 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 576-1630
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN L GARTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARTNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN L GARTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARTNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994